NH HB1533 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 224-78; House Journal 20, PG.1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 224-78; House Journal 20, PG.1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting bullying in the state house and legislative office building.
Title
Prohibiting bullying in the state house and legislative office building.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 224-78; House Journal 20, PG.1199 | |
2012-02-15 | House Special Order to End of Next Week's Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.967 | |
2012-02-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.909 | |
2012-02-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.681; House Calendar 14, PG.819 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-01-31 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/7/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-12-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Constitutional Review and Statutory Recodification; House Journal 7, PG. 359 |