NH HB1547 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring mileage-based exit numbers on Tier I highways.
Title
Requiring mileage-based exit numbers on Tier I highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 15 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/06/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 9 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 |