NH HB155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 06/25/2013; Chapter 0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 06/25/2013; Chapter 0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of open source software by state agencies; including the department of information technology in the uniform electronic transactions act; and repealing the information practices act.
Title
Relative to the use of open source software by state agencies; including the department of information technology in the uniform electronic transactions act; and repealing the information practices act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 06/25/2013; Chapter 0118 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-29 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1146s and #1308s (Rep Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1509 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1146s, 1308s Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1308s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1146s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1146s, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/20/13, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-06 | House | Declination of Referral Under House Rule 46(f) (Rep Wallner); House Journal 16, PG.321 |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 16, PG.300 |
2013-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0065h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.300 |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment #0065h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.300 |
2013-01-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0065h; House Calendar 11, PG.172-173 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0065h for Feb 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.149 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.184 |