NH HB1555 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/19/2014; Chapter 0151; Effective 1/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/19/2014; Chapter 0151; Effective 1/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the neglect of elderly, disabled, or impaired adults and relative to financial exploitation.
Title
Relative to the neglect of elderly, disabled, or impaired adults and relative to financial exploitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/19/2014; Chapter 0151; Effective 1/01/2015 |
2014-05-14 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1649eba Adopted Voice Vote (In recess from 4/30/14) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1649e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/24/14; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 100, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1054h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment #2014-1054h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Warden) |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1054h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2014-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 3/6/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2014-02-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 12 (Vote 10-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |