NH HB1564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 185-152 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 185-152 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring school districts to provide breakfast for students.
Title
Requiring school districts to provide breakfast for students.
Sponsors
Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. Bonnie Ham [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. James Allard [R] |
Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 185-152 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |