NH HB1586 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statute of limitations for sexual assault.
Title
Relative to the statute of limitations for sexual assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Interim Study (Y: 200 N: 123 NV: 33 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-1) |
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/94238069790 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-123 03/11/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Bordenet): Motion Failed DV 161-162 03/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 43 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary) |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-04 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 27 |