NH HB1602 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-21 - Executive Session: 09/28/2016 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-21 - Executive Session: 09/28/2016 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Mary Cooney [D] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. Bill Ohm [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. Paul Henle [D] |
Rep. Susan Almy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | House | Executive Session: 09/28/2016 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2016-09-07 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/20/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2016-02-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/10/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2016 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building201 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 4 P. 20 |