NH HB163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 309-59 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 309-59 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of child abuse.
Title
Relative to the definition of child abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - ITL (Y: 309 N: 59 NV: 6 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 309-59 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 17 |
2019-01-31 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Testerman) 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 2 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 39 |