NH HB1635 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 214, Section 2 Effective 9/9/2014; Remainder Effective 7/11/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 214, Section 2 Effective 9/9/2014; Remainder Effective 7/11/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to community mental health programs and making appropriations therefor and relative to disposition of funds obtained by the attorney general.
Title
Relative to community mental health programs and making appropriations therefor and relative to disposition of funds obtained by the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - OTP (Y: 173 N: 125 NV: 33 Abs: 56) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 214, Section 2 Effective 9/9/2014; Remainder Effective 7/11/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1996c; Adopted, Div 239-81 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1996c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1996c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-29 | House | ==RECONVENE==Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2014; 12:30 PM; State House 103 |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/28/2014; 12:15 PM; State House 103 ==RECESSED== |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Forrester, Odell, and Larsen; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Nordgren, Huot, Benn, Leishman |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1809s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1809s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1809s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 103, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Finance |
2014-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-125 |
2014-02-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-02-11 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-02-06 | House | Division III Work Session: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee |