NH HB1655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the New Hampshire vaccine association to include adult vaccines.
Title
Expanding the New Hampshire vaccine association to include adult vaccines.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Richard Osborne [D] | Rep. Greg Indruk [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] |
Rep. Gary Woods [D] | Rep. Kristina Fargo [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 185 N: 118 NV: 48 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1001h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-118 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 120 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-1001h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 120 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1001h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 59 |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-12-13 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 30 |