NH HB1680 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 260-117 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 260-117 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting the sale of dogs and cats by retail pet shops.
Title
Relative to prohibiting the sale of dogs and cats by retail pet shops.
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Kelley [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 260 N: 117 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 260-117 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-02-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/06/2024 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/31/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-05 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/22/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 |