NH HB1682 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the civics test graduation requirement.
Title
Relative to the civics test graduation requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/18/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 12 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-22 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |