NH HB1687 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the installation of audio and video surveillance equipment in special education school buses.
Title
Relative to the installation of audio and video surveillance equipment in special education school buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0676h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0676h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2020-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0676h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 50 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 31 |