NH HB1692 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - House II. Remainder Effective 06/01/2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - House II. Remainder Effective 06/01/2010
Summary
Establishing a commission on primary care workforce issues.
Title
Establishing a commission on primary care workforce issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | House II. Remainder Effective 06/01/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | House I. Section 3 Effective 11/01/2015 | |
2010-06-03 | House Signed by the Governor 06/01/2010; Chapter 0114 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-13 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.2153 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/5/10; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Hearing: April 27, 2010, Room 103, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11, Pg.265 | |
2010-03-10 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 207-99; House Journal 23, PG.1289 | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for March 10 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1030-1031 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-27 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-21 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs; House Journal 10, PG.458 | |
2010-01-21 | House Late Drafting and Introduction Allowed by Rules Committee; House Journal 10, PG.458 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2688&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |