NH HB1692 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the procedures relating to parole violation and parole revocation.
Title
Revising the procedures relating to parole violation and parole revocation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 15 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 89 |
2016-03-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 23 |