NH HB174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to alternative treatment center licenses.
Title
Relative to alternative treatment center licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14 |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 10 |
2019-01-30 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 40 |