NH HB317 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB317
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/03/2018; Chapter 374; Eff. 10/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/03/2018; Chapter 374; Eff. 10/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to changes in the system benefits charge.
Title
Relative to changes in the system benefits charge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Table (Y: 158 N: 180 NV: 28 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2018-01-09 - House - Reconsider (Y: 164 N: 181 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2018-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 173 N: 171 NV: 15 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - Reconsider (Y: 164 N: 181 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2018-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 173 N: 171 NV: 15 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/03/2018; Chapter 374; Eff. 10/02/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2051c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Lay CofC report 2051c on Table (Rep. Oxenham): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-180 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2051c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2051c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Innis, Feltes; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Vose, D. Thomas, Vadney, Notter 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1594s and Requests CofC (Rep. Barry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1594s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1594s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1594s, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1594s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1594s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-09 | House | Reconsider HB 317 (Rep. J. Graham): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 164-181 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 15 |
2018-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2483h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-171 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 13 |
2018-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2017-2483h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 12 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to third order of business on 1/9/2018 (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 90 |
2017-11-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2483h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-26 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 11/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2017-2459h: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-09-28 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-07-31 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 8 |
Same As/Similar To
HB317 (Carry Over) 2017-11-07 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate