NH HB358 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to combustion of wood residue at municipal waste combustors.
Title
Relative to combustion of wood residue at municipal waste combustors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 204-137 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 26 |
2019-03-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 32 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 46 |