NH HB399 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a force of state capitol security officers with the authority to carry firearms.
Title
Establishing a force of state capitol security officers with the authority to carry firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/13/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 8:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-02-05 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 221 |