NH HB412 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB412
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the long-term consequences of decommissioning nuclear power plants.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the long-term consequences of decommissioning nuclear power plants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-21 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-03-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB412 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)