NH HB412 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB412
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2172h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2172h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of environmental services for the purpose of funding public water system projects.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of environmental services for the purpose of funding public water system projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Buco [D] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. William Hatch [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2172h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-09-15 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-08-31 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/14/2021 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Finance House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB412 (Carry Over) 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2172h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar)