NH HB446 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the effects of recreational vehicles and other vehicles used in recreational activities on class 5 and 6 roads.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the effects of recreational vehicles and other vehicles used in recreational activities on class 5 and 6 roads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB446 11/02/2021 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 15 |
2021-10-27 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-09-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2021-08-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/08/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94760331850 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93611943701 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 48 |
Same As/Similar To
HB446 (Carry Over) 2021-10-27 - Executive Session: 10/27/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=682&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB446 |