NH HB455 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Veto Overriden 05/30/2019: Eff: 05/30/2019; Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the penalty for capital murder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the penalty for capital murder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Veto Override (Y: 247 N: 123 NV: 6 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 279 N: 88 NV: 7 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseVeto Overriden 05/30/2019: Eff: 05/30/2019; Chapter 42
2019-05-30SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 455-FN Become Law: Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23HouseVeto Overridden 05/23/2019: Regular Calendar 247-123 by Required Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 16 P. 2
2019-05-06HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 05/03/2019 House Journal 16 P. 2
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-22SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 279-88 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 11
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Reps Hall
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=185&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB455
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=187&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=SP&id=187
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=71&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0455&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB455&ddlsponsors=&lsr=185
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=127&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0455&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB455&ddlsponsors=&lsr=185
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=201&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0455&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB455&ddlsponsors=&lsr=185
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=163&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0455&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB455&ddlsponsors=&lsr=185

Bill Comments

feedback