NH HB459 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to challenged voter affidavits.
Title
Relative to challenged voter affidavits.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 33 |
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 10/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB459 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar)