NH HB474 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 224; Eff. 1/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 224; Eff. 1/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating the use of a cell site simulator device.
Title
Regulating the use of a cell site simulator device.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] | Rep. Mark King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 224; Eff. 1/1/2018 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2156e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2156e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-01 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1694s (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 2 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1694s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1694s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1694s, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0268h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0268h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0268h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 14 |