NH HB476 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB476
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duties of registers of probate.
Title
Relative to the duties of registers of probate.
Sponsors
Rep. James Belanger [R] | Rep. Franklin Sterling [R] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 146 NV: 16 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 146 NV: 16 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Avard moved to call the question, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0727h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 82 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0727h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 82 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0727h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 23-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 41 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-06 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/20/2018 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-24 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division I Work Session: 01/31/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-11 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Finance 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 86 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2451h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-146 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 85 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2451h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 79 |
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2451h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-10 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-09-27 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-09-19 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-09-18 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-09-18 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-08-07 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-08-07 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-02 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-24 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate