NH HB481 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB481
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 250; eff. I. Sec4 eff 6/24/22 II. Sec 5 and 6 eff 7/1/25 III Rem eff 7/1/22 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 250; eff. I. Sec4 eff 6/24/22 II. Sec 5 and 6 eff 7/1/25 III Rem eff 7/1/22 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the office of the right-to-know ombudsman and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the office of the right-to-know ombudsman and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 250; eff. I. Sec4 eff 6/24/22 II. Sec 5 and 6 eff 7/1/25 III Rem eff 7/1/22 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1554s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1554s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1554s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2126h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Amendment # 2021-2126h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-10-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2126h 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; ) House Calendar 48 P. 11 |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-09-15 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-08-31 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/14/2021 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 |
2021-03-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 74 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 74 |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 22 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94597513398 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 49 |
Same As/Similar To
HB481 (Carry Over) 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2126h 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )