NH HB493 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB493
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the state meat inspection program.
Title
Eliminating the state meat inspection program.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 52 |
2023-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB493 10/24/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 11 |
2023-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 10/24/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-08-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB493 (Carry Over) 2023-08-22 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303