NH HB510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical insurance covering automobiles.
Title
Relative to medical insurance covering automobiles.
Sponsors
Rep. David Lisle [D] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Joseph Stallcop [L] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 15 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16 |