NH HB518 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB518
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Hearing: 03/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Hearing: 03/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of occupations by the office of professional licensure and certification.
Title
Relative to the administration of occupations by the office of professional licensure and certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-01-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2426h and 2024-0023h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 70 |
2024-01-05 | House | FLAM # 2024-0023h (Rep. Grote): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 70 |
2024-01-05 | House | Amendment # 2023-2426h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 66 |
2023-12-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Grote, C. McGuire, T. Lekas, Juliet Smith, Mangipudi, F. Davis, M. Smith, Lynn, Grassie, P. Schmidt) 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2426h (NT) 11/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 12 |
2023-10-24 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-2349h: 11/06/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 43 |
2023-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB518 (Carry Over) 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308