NH HB536 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB536
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 102; 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 102; 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to death benefits for public works employees killed in the line of duty, and relative to workers' compensation offsets for certain retirement system benefits.
Title
Relative to death benefits for public works employees killed in the line of duty, and relative to workers' compensation offsets for certain retirement system benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 102; 07/01/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 19 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Ought to Pass; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Special Order to to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2021-2118h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-10-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2118h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 33 |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-09-15 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-08-31 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/14/2021 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 |
2021-03-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 9 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 9 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92995497899 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 52 |
Same As/Similar To
HB536 (Carry Over) 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2118h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar)