NH HB569 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to offering vocational training as part of the drug court and alternative drug offender grant program.
Title
Relative to offering vocational training as part of the drug court and alternative drug offender grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Alan Bershtein [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 39 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 18 |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91815905671 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 54 |