NH HB573 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/23/2013; Effective 07/23/2013; Chapter 0242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/23/2013; Effective 07/23/2013; Chapter 0242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes.
Title
Relative to the use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - C OF C #2098C (Y: 284 N: 66 NV: 30 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment 1904s (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - OTP/AM 0797H(NT) (Y: 286 N: 64 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment 1904s (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - OTP/AM 0797H(NT) (Y: 286 N: 64 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/23/2013; Effective 07/23/2013; Chapter 0242 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2200e Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1715 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2200e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2098c Adopted, Regular Calendar 284-66; House Journal 52, PG.1698-1700 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2098c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2098c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Reagan, Gilmour |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps J.MacKay, S.Schmidt, Sherman, and Andrews-Ahearn; House Journal 49, PG.1566 |
2013-06-05 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1631s and Requests C of C (Rep J.MacKay): Motion Adopted Division Vote 292-47; House Journal 49, PG.1566 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1631s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2013-1904s, Regular Calendar 6Y-18N, Amendment Failed; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1631s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 573 is Special Ordered, 2/3 Necessary; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1631s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/11/13, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0797h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 286-64; House Journal 27, PG.860-876 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment #0797h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.860-874 |
2013-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0797h (New Title); House Calendar 23 PG.619-632 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0797h(NT) for Mar 20 (Vote 14-1; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.592-593 |
2013-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 3/7/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/6/2013 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.200 |