NH HB586 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to registration of automobile utility trailers.
Title
Relative to registration of automobile utility trailers.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-09-02 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-23 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 7 |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/23/2016 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 5 |
2016-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/15/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 01/20/2016 |
2016-01-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2485h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 13 |
2016-01-20 | House | Amendment #2015-2485h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 13 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2485h for Jan 6 (Vote 8-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 28 |
2015-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-09-21 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/29/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |