NH HB616 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.752
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.752
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the enforcement of false swearing and perjury in official matters.
Title
Relative to the enforcement of false swearing and perjury in official matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Rep. George Lambert [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.752 |
2013-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.503 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.202 |