NH HB646 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshire correctional industries.
Title
Relative to New Hampshire correctional industries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-0) |
2014-10-01 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-08-05 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-08 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-02 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.204 |