NH HB650 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2017; Chapter 192; Eff. 7/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to procedures of the board of psychologists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to procedures of the board of psychologists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-05HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/30/2017; Chapter 192; Eff. 7/1/2017
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-06HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2086e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 150
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2086e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19
2017-05-18HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1315s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 6
2017-04-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1315s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1315s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1315s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-15SenateHearing: 03/22/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0666h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 29
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0666h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 29
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0666h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14
2017-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/28/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-01HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback