NH HB727 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB727
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to boat ramp and parking improvements at Mount Sunapee state park beach and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to boat ramp and parking improvements at Mount Sunapee state park beach and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] |
Rep. Clyde Carson [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Beth Rodd [D] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/18/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Public Works and Highways 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 22 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0347h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2019-02-28 | House | Amendment # 2019-0347h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0347h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 25 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 28 |
Same As/Similar To
HB727 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)