NH HB82 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - House Signed By Governor 06/28/2011; Effective 06/28/2011; Chapter 0219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - House Signed By Governor 06/28/2011; Effective 06/28/2011; Chapter 0219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the annulment of criminal records.
Title
Relative to the annulment of criminal records.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Charron [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Rep. John Tholl [R] |
Rep. David Welch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | House Signed By Governor 06/28/2011; Effective 06/28/2011; Chapter 0219 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1728 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #2195s (Rep Swinford): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1712 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2195s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.518 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Committee Amendment 2195s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.518 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-2195s, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Hearing: 5/12/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2011-02-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.358 | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.230 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/20/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |