NH HR23 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Honor and Remember Flag as a symbol of the service and sacrifice of the armed forces.
Title
Recognizing the Honor and Remember Flag as a symbol of the service and sacrifice of the armed forces.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] | Rep. Todd Smith [R] |
Rep. Lorrie Carey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |