NH SB102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring disclosure of federal income tax returns by presidential and vice-presidential candidates.
Title
Requiring disclosure of federal income tax returns by presidential and vice-presidential candidates.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] | Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |