NH SB109 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to receivership of nursing homes and other residential health care facilities.
Title
Relative to receivership of nursing homes and other residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee Not Voted On; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |