NH SB12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0017; Effective 07/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0017; Effective 07/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to jurisdiction over surrogacy cases under RSA 168-B.
Title
Relative to jurisdiction over surrogacy cases under RSA 168-B.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0017; Effective 07/04/2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1545 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1305 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0502s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0502s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0502s, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 1/13/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |