NH SB123 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 09/11/2011; Chapter 0251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 09/11/2011; Chapter 0251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notification if a person found incompetent to stand trial and civilly committed is released into the community.
Title
Relative to notification if a person found incompetent to stand trial and civilly committed is released into the community.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Rep. Gregory Sorg [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 09/11/2011; Chapter 0251 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2414c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2414c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1815 | |
2011-06-16 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2414c, as Passed by Senate, Filed; House Calendar 49A, PG.1687 | |
2011-06-09 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/14/2011, 12:30 p.m., Room 101, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-06-08 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Swinford, Kreis, Gagne, and Welch; House Journal 51, PG.1723 | |
2011-06-08 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Swinford): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1723 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Houde, Groen and Luther; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1589h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1589h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1532-1533 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1589h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1532-1533 | |
2011-05-03 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1589h (New Title); House Calendar 39, PG.1348 | |
2011-05-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1589h(NT) for May 18 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1320 | |
2011-04-26 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-04-19 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-04-07 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/14/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-30 | House Public Hearing: 4/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.185 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 3:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.37 |