NH SB134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the administration of the meals and rooms tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the administration of the meals and rooms tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2646e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2646e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-13SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 9
2019-05-16HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 14
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1709h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 14
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1709h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 14
2019-04-30HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1709h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8
2019-04-24House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-10House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-02HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-28SenateHearing: 02/06/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback