NH SB142 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reorganizing the permitting process within the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to reorganizing the permitting process within the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.116 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/10/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 5, Pg.45 |