NH SB172 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1594h; New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.550
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1594h; New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.550
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to performance-based school accountability criteria.
Title
Relative to performance-based school accountability criteria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1594h; New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.550 | |
2011-06-01 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1594h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1626 | |
2011-06-01 | House Amendment #1594h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1626 | |
2011-05-25 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1594h (New Title); House Calendar 43, PG.1521 | |
2011-05-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1594h(NT) for June 1 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1495 | |
2011-04-27 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/21/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 28, Pg.883 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0529s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.86 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment 0529s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.86 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0529s, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Hearing: 2/22/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education, Senate Journal 3, Pg.39 |