NH SB181 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to abortion care.
Title
Relative to access to abortion care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Special Order to 03/09/2023, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/22/2023 Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2023; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |