NH SB183 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1497h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1497h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to identification of voters, processing absentee ballots, and voluntary political expenditure limitations.
Title
Relative to identification of voters, processing absentee ballots, and voluntary political expenditure limitations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1497h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1497h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1815h (Rep James Belanger) Motion Failed Div 70-194 |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment #2014-1497h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-14 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep. James Belanger) |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1497h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-23 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/1/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2014 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-17 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 4/2/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/2/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 =RECESSED= |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2239s, New Title, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 2239s, New Title, Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 2239s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2239s, New Title, 1/30/14; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |