NH SB187 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0044 Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0044 Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a patient to designate a caregiver upon entry to a medical facility.
Title
Allowing a patient to designate a caregiver upon entry to a medical facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0044 Effective 01/01/2016 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/30/2015); Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1778 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1422e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1422-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 4/15/2015); House Journal 34, PG. 1564 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1545 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1304 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-25 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/2/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0836s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0836s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0836s, 3/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |